WA HB1321 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain public facilities district's authorization to acquire, construct, own, remodel, maintain, equip, reequip, repair, finance, and operate one or more recreational facilities other than a ski area with voter approval.
Title
Concerning certain public facilities district's authorization to acquire, construct, own, remodel, maintain, equip, reequip, repair, finance, and operate one or more recreational facilities other than a ski area with voter approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Local Government. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5243 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.