WA HB1319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the frequency of evaluations for certain educators.
Title
Concerning the frequency of evaluations for certain educators.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-09 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Education |