WA HB1304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning career and technical education in alternative learning experience programs.
Title
Concerning career and technical education in alternative learning experience programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5448 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.