WA HB1302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a self-exclusion program for persons with a gambling problem or gambling disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a self-exclusion program for persons with a gambling problem or gambling disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-25HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce & Gaming.
2019-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-04HouseCOG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.

Same As/Similar To

SB5416 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback