WA HB1301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the employee antiretaliation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the employee antiretaliation act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-01-31HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-01-31HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Same As/Similar To

SB5528 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback