WA HB1300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing documentation and processes governing landlords' claims for damage to residential premises.
Title
Addressing documentation and processes governing landlords' claims for damage to residential premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | HHSV - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 18 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |