WA HB1299 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Environment.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Environment.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Including cattle feedlots implementing best management practices within the statutory exemption for odor or fugitive dust caused by agricultural activity.
Title
Including cattle feedlots implementing best management practices within the statutory exemption for odor or fugitive dust caused by agricultural activity.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Environment. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB5196 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.