WA HB1296 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing limitations on rental housing inspections.
Title
Providing limitations on rental housing inspections.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Sen. James McCune [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-05 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-04 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5495 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.