WA HB1294 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing youth voter registration.
Title
Enhancing youth voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-11 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-11 | House | SG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |