WA HB1272 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning publishing, formatting, and distribution of the state and local voters' pamphlets.
Title
Concerning publishing, formatting, and distribution of the state and local voters' pamphlets.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Sen. Leonard Christian [R] | Sen. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Effective date 1/1/2025. |
2024-03-14 | House | Chapter 78, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2024-01-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 8. |
2024-01-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-01-24 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-31 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 32 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |