WA HB1272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a motor vehicle registration hiatus for certain motor vehicles that are not operated on public roads.
Title
Creating a motor vehicle registration hiatus for certain motor vehicles that are not operated on public roads.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |