WA HB1244 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum per pupil limit for enrichment levy authority.
Title
Increasing the maximum per pupil limit for enrichment levy authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2023-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5692 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.