WA HB1239 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a simple and uniform system for complaints related to, and instituting a code of educator ethics for, conduct within or involving public elementary and secondary schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a simple and uniform system for complaints related to, and instituting a code of educator ethics for, conduct within or involving public elementary and secondary schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-23HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-07HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-07HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-07HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM.
2023-02-02HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a300New CodeSee Bill Text
28a400New CodeSee Bill Text
4306bNew CodeSee Bill Text
9a16100Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1239&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1239.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1239-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1239-S2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1239%20HBA%20ED%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1239%20HBR%20ED%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1239%20HBR%20APP%2023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127697&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30644&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127697&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30812&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback