WA HB1238 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the Washington center for court research and the office of public defense to access juvenile case records.
Title
Allowing the Washington center for court research and the office of public defense to access juvenile case records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-25 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-11 | Chapter 440, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-11 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 2; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-25 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-21 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-21 | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. | |
2009-04-17 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-17 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-09 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-29 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5133 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.