WA HB1237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining family resource centers.
Title
Defining family resource centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-14 | House | Chapter 39, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-01-28 | House | CYF - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 216 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 14c | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |