WA HB1232 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing the college bound scholarship program.
Title
Enhancing the college bound scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-25 | House | Chapter 174, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-13 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-27 | House | PEW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 118 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 118 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |