WA HB1218 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the requirement that contempt of court sanctions be served in the county jail.
Title
Changing the requirement that contempt of court sanctions be served in the county jail.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] | Rep. Charles Ross [R] |
Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-31 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-09 | Chapter 37, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-09 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-03 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-03-31 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-31 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |