WA HB1208 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date 4/21/2021***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date 4/21/2021***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the learning assistance program.
Title
Modifying the learning assistance program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Effective date 4/21/2021***. |
2021-04-21 | House | Chapter 111, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2021-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Subjects
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, OFFICE (OSPI)
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, OFFICE (OSPI)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 165 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 165 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 165 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 165 | 035 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 165 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 165 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 300 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 300 | 139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 305 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 320 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 710 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |