WA HB1208 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning property tax administration.
Title
Concerning property tax administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-06 | Chapter 350, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-06 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-18 | Deferred action on final passage as amended by Senate. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-13 | Notice to reconsider withdrawn. | |
2009-04-13 | Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-05 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Finance. | |
2009-02-11 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-11 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-11 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |