WA HB1203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting school districts from the state portion of sales and use taxes on school construction.
Title
Exempting school districts from the state portion of sales and use taxes on school construction.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1203&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1203.pdf |