WA HB1202 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing meaningful civil remedies for persons injured as a result of police misconduct, including by allowing for an award of attorney fees in addition to damages and injunctive and declaratory relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing meaningful civil remedies for persons injured as a result of police misconduct, including by allowing for an award of attorney fees in addition to damages and injunctive and declaratory relief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-18HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-05HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1202&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1202.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1202-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1202-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1202%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1202%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1202%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123447&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28457&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123447&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28619&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback