WA HB1198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Hearing: Mar 22 @ 8:00 am in Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring health care providers sanctioned for sexual misconduct to notify patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring health care providers sanctioned for sexual misconduct to notify patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04HouseVote on third reading will be reconsidered.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-15HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback