WA HB1160 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning health provider contracts.
Title
Concerning health provider contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-26 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |