WA HB1152 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing consumer gender discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing consumer gender discrimination.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-01HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2023-01-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5171 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1986New CodeSee Bill Text
1986140Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback