WA HB1145 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing mail theft provisions.
Title
Establishing mail theft provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-27 | Chapter 164, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-27 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to General Government Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2011-02-11 | PSEP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-11 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-11 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-13 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5060 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.