WA HB1140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending surcharges on court filing fees for deposit in the judicial stabilization trust account to July 1, 2021.
Title
Extending surcharges on court filing fees for deposit in the judicial stabilization trust account to July 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2017-06-30 | House | Chapter 2, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5809 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.