WA HB1136 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring employers to reimburse employees for necessary expenditures and losses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring employers to reimburse employees for necessary expenditures and losses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2023-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-03HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:30 AM.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2023-01-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4912New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1136&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1136.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1136-S.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1136-S%20AMH%20ROBE%20LEON%20817.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1136-S%20AMH%20CONN%20LEON%20818.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1136%20HBA%20LAWS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1136%20HBR%20LAWS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65626
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65870
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67025
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67134
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127146&actionText=LAWS%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30581&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback