WA HB1136 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Implementing child support pass-through payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing child support pass-through payments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-01-25HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB5144 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback