WA HB1132 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of water supply for farming and rural economic development.
Title
Concerning the protection of water supply for farming and rural economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | 14 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 14 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 14 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 14 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 14 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |