WA HB1122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the retirement age for state guard members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the retirement age for state guard members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-24SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseHHSV - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans.
2021-01-08HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3816015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1122&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1122.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1122%20HBA%20HHSV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1122%20HBR%20HHSV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1122%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1122%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1122%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1122%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123260&actionText=HHSV%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28413&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123260&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1122&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123260&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28896&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback