WA HB1109 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning victims of sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning victims of sexual assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseEffective date 4/26/2021.
2021-04-26HouseChapter 118, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-26HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-12HousePassed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-03-29SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-29SenateFloor amendment
2021-03-29SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-18SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-25House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-01-07HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43101278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570New CodeSee Bill Text
70125110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1109&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1109-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1109-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1109-S%20AMH%20ORWA%20LEON%20695.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1109-S.E%20AMS%20LAW%20S1756.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1109-S.E%20AMS%20DHIN%20S2319.2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1109%20HBA%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1109%20HBR%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1109-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1109-S.E%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1109-S.E%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1109-S.E%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1109-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1109-S.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1109-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1109-S.E%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123229&actionText=PS%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28378&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123229&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123229&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28793&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123229&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-29-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123229&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback