WA HB1098 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing bail practices.
Title
Addressing bail practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-07 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-07 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |