WA HB1098 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - Referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - Referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the duty of clergy to report child abuse or neglect.
Title
Concerning the duty of clergy to report child abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-20 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-20 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2022-12-30 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5280 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Human Services.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 44 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 44 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |