WA HB1091 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Hearing: Jan 21 @ 1:30 pm in House Committee on Environment & Energy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing greenhouse gas emissions by reducing the carbon intensity of transportation fuel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing greenhouse gas emissions by reducing the carbon intensity of transportation fuel.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM
2021-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2021-01-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5231 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-15 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19112110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19112120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4620202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4625052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4625060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4625100Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70aNew CodeSee Bill Text
70a153150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70a153160Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback