WA HB1085 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring lobbying reports to be filed electronically.
Title
Requiring lobbying reports to be filed electronically.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-28 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-01-29 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | SG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |