WA HB1085 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning body piercing.
Title
Concerning body piercing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-11 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-06 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2009-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |