WA HB1074 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting youth from tobacco products and vapor products by increasing the minimum legal age of sale of tobacco and vapor products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting youth from tobacco products and vapor products by increasing the minimum legal age of sale of tobacco and vapor products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseEffective date 1/1/2020.
2019-04-05HouseChapter 15, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-05HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-01HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-03-29SenatePresident signed.
2019-03-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-03-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-21SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-20HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseFloor amendment
2019-02-15HousePlaced on second reading.
2019-02-13HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-13HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-13HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-01-25HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-25HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2018-12-31HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5057 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1074&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1074.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1074.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1074.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1074.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117082&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-20-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1074&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117082&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1074&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback