WA HB1069 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning local government fiscal flexibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning local government fiscal flexibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Finance: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-18SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-18SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-18SenateHLG - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-25House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28HouseFIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Finance.
2021-01-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-15HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2021-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3521290Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3567210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6728180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67281816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8204050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214320Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214340Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214450Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8455050Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1069&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1069.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1069-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1069-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1069-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1069-S2.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1069-S2%20AMH%20DUFA%20HARA%20250.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1069-S2%20AMH%20POLL%20WRIK%20085.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1069-S2%20AMH%20ROBE%20WRIK%20098.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1069-S2.E%20AMS%20FORT%20S2724.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1069-S2.E%20AMS%20WARN%20S2723.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1069%20HBA%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1069%20HBR%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1069%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1069-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1069-S2.E%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1069-S2.E%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1069-S2.E%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1069-S2.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1069-S2.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123130&actionText=LG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28179&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123130&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28364&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123130&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1069&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123130&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28861&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123130&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1069&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback