WA HB1069 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning preservation of DNA work product.
Title
Concerning preservation of DNA work product.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-11 | House | Chapter 221, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2015-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-20 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-20 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5253 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.