WA HB1067 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designating the Suciasaurus rex as the official dinosaur of the state of Washington.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the Suciasaurus rex as the official dinosaur of the state of Washington.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2020-12-31HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
120New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback