WA HB1062 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning deception by law enforcement officers during custodial interrogations.
Title
Concerning deception by law enforcement officers during custodial interrogations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-23 | House | CSJR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2024-01-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2022-12-21 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6293 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-22 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | New Code | See Bill Text |