WA HB1060 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the weatherization statute.
Title
Updating the weatherization statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-13 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-23 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-02 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2009-01-02 | Prefiled for introduction. |