WA HB1059 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Delaying implementation of revisions to the school levy lid.
Title
Delaying implementation of revisions to the school levy lid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-01-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-01-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-01-23 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-01-16 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2017-01-12 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-12 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5023 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-15 - Effective date 7/23/2017*.