WA HB1056 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning open public meeting notice requirements and declared emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning open public meeting notice requirements and declared emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-01-22HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-01-22HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-01-22HouseFloor amendment
2021-01-22House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-01-19HousePlaced on second reading.
2021-01-15HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2020-12-28HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4230New CodeSee Bill Text
4230040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230090Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1056&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1056.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1056-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1056-S.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1056-S%20AMH%20GOEH%20WRIK%20059.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1056%20HBA%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1056%20HBR%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1056-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1056-S.E%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123102&actionText=LG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28179&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123102&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-22-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1056&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback