WA HB1056 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a task force to identify the role of the workplace in helping curb domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a task force to identify the role of the workplace in helping curb domestic violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-25SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2020-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2020-01-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-16SenateFloor amendment
2020-01-16SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-01-14SenatePlaced on third reading.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-24HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2018-12-14HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1056&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1056.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1056.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1056.E2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1056.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117032&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1056&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117032&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-16-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1056&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117032&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1056&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback