WA HB1052 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring institutions of higher education to make an early registration process available to spouses and domestic partners of active members of the military.
Title
Requiring institutions of higher education to make an early registration process available to spouses and domestic partners of active members of the military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-17 | House | Chapter 14, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | HIE - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-10 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2014-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |