WA HB1049 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration and operation of flood control districts.
Title
Concerning the administration and operation of flood control districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-01-31 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-01-31 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2013-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |