WA HB1046 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning community solar programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning community solar programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2020-12-22HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8028New CodeSee Bill Text
8028370Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8028375Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback