WA HB1027 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing changes to child support based on the child support schedule work group report.
Title
Implementing changes to child support based on the child support schedule work group report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass JUDI 13 bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2013-02-28 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2013-01-30 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-01-30 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
2013-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |