WA HB1025 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning local parks funding options.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning local parks funding options.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2020-12-15HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5006 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback